EP4031055 - NON-METALLIC ULTRASOUND-DETECTABLE MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55905 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Christine U. 1509 Belvior Lane NE Byron, Minnesota 55920 / US | 02 /
GREENLEAF, James F. 600 4th Street SW, Apt. 101 Rochester, Minnesota 55902-3243 / US | 03 /
HERRICK, James L. 3926 Manor Woods Drive NW Rochester, Minnesota 55901-7571 / US | 04 /
MILLER, II, Alan L. 2606 24th Street NW Rochester, Minnesota 55901-0671 / US | 05 /
YASZEMSKI, Michael J. 2806 15th Avenue SW Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | 06 /
JAKUB, James W. 1421 20th Street SW Rochester, Minnesota 55902-2217 / US | 07 /
URBAN, Matthew W. 3634 Odyssey Drive SW Rochester, Minnesota 55902-1549 / US | 08 /
WOOD, Benjamin G. 1523 21st Avenue NE Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 09 /
BRINKMAN, Nathan J. 5291 Scenic Oak Drive SW Rochester, MN 55902 / US | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20786193.1 | 21.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020US51844 | Priority number, date | US201962903078P | 20.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962903078 P | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021055966 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031055 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, A61B8/08, A61B17/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B8/0841 (US);
A61B8/0833 (EP);
A61B8/4494 (US);
A61B8/46 (US);
A61B8/469 (US);
A61B8/481 (US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US);
A61B8/5269 (US);
A61K49/221 (US);
A61K49/223 (US);
A61N5/1007 (US);
A61B2017/00964 (EP);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3941 (EP);
A61B2090/3954 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61B2090/3995 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | NICHTMETALLISCHE ULTRASCHALLNACHWEISBARE MARKIERUNGEN | [2022/30] | English: | NON-METALLIC ULTRASOUND-DETECTABLE MARKERS | [2022/30] | French: | MARQUEURS NON MÉTALLIQUES DÉTECTABLES PAR ULTRASONS | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 06.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2023 | Decision despatched | 06.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0051136 (NYCOMED AMERSHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-14,31 * page 12, line 16 - page 16, line 24; figure 1; examples 31, 32 * * page 29, line 24 - page 30, line 25 * * page 35, line 10 - line 22 * * page 45, line 16 - page 46, line 20 * [I] 4,5,10,20,23,32-34; | [XI]WO0241786 (SENORX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,13,15,19,23-29,31 * page 8, line 3 - line 13; figures 1-10; claims 1-3 * * page 19, line 7 - line 19 *[I] 4,5,7-12,14,16-18,20-22,30; | [XI]WO2014081940 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,15-18,23-26,28,31 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraphs [0109] , [ 113] , [ 115] , [ 116] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0139] * [I] 4,5,14,20-22,27,29,30; | [XI]US2014221820 (MCKINNIS PETER S [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051] * [I] 32-34; | [XI]WO2018045222 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-3,14,15,19,31,32 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-24 * * paragraphs [0075] , [0 84] , [0 96] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0126] * [I] 4,5,7,9,11,20,21,33,34; | [XI]US2018280111 (PARISH DAVID [US]) [X] 32 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-5; claims 1, 16 * [I] 1,6,13,30,33,34; | [XI]US2018289444 (BLAIR WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,13,23,31 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3-13 * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * [I] 4,5,11,12,14,20-22,32-34; | [XAI]WO2019118501 (HOLOGIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,13,15,31 * paragraphs [0075] , [0 94]; figures 2A-4C, 12A-F; claim 10 * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0108] * [A] 33,34 [I] 2,3,5,8,10-12,14,16-18,20-22,30 |