Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022361549 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022548491 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114466596B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2024 | B | CN114466596 | 10.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3152198 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020354508 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4033920 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022005329 | 14.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022003343 | 14.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | WO2020EP76781 | 24.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021058680 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3797601 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19199285 | 24.09.2019 |