EP4038184 - PURIFICATION PROCESS BASED ON MAGNETIC BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lab-on-a-Bead AB Virdings Allé 28 754 50 Uppsala / SE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOTTEAU, Veronique Långsjövägen 14 131 33 Nacka / SE | 02 /
ERIKSSON, Kristofer Hässelbyholm Inspektorbostaden 645 92 Strängnäs / SE | 03 /
OSCARSSON, Sven Årgångsgatan 1 117 57 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
BRECHMANN, Nils Arnold Maltgatan 8 LGH 1506 120 79 Stockholm / SE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 5275 102 46 Stockholm / SE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20786293.9 | 05.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020EP77861 | Priority number, date | SE20190030317 | 05.10.2019 Original published format: SE 1930317 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064244 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038184 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N13/00, C07K1/14, C12M1/00, C12P21/02 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (EP,US);
C12M29/10 (EP,US);
C12M47/10 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN BASIEREND AUF MAGNETISCHEN KÜGELCHEN | [2022/32] | English: | PURIFICATION PROCESS BASED ON MAGNETIC BEADS | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION À BASE DE BILLES MAGNÉTIQUES | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 04.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015034428 (LAB ON A BEAD AB [SE]) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [I]WO2018122089 (GE HEALTHCARE BIO SCIENCES AB [SE]) [I] 1-27 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 2,3 * * example 1 * * claims 1,27,47,51 *; | [ID] - NILS A. BRECHMANN ET AL, "Pilot-scale process for magnetic bead purification of antibodies directly from non-clarified CHO cell culture", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (20190130), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:10.1002/btpr.2775, ISSN 8756-7938, page e2775, XP055758818 [ID] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.2775 | [A] - MORITZ EBELER ET AL, "One-step integrated clarification and purification of a monoclonal antibody using Protein A Mag Sepharose beads and a cGMP-compliant high-gradient magnetic separator", NEW BIOTECHNOLOGY, NL, (20170221), vol. 42, doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2018.02.007, ISSN 1871-6784, pages 48 - 55, XP055457946 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2018.02.007 | by applicant | WO2018234115 | - SINGHNRIPEN et al., "Clarification of recombinant proteins from high cell density mammalian cell culture systems using new improved depth filters", Biotechnology and bioengineering, (20130000), vol. 110, no. 7, pages 1964 - 1972 | - TOMICSLADJANA et al., "Complete clarification solution for processing high density cell culture harvests", Separation and Purification Technology, (20150000), vol. 141, doi:10.1016/j.seppur.2014.12.002, pages 269 - 275, XP029132484 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.seppur.2014.12.002 | - CLINCKEMARIE-FRANGOISE et al., "Very high density of CHO cells in perfusion by ATF or TFF in WAVE bioreactor™. Part I. Effect of the cell density on the process", Biotechnology progress, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 754 - 767 | - CLINCKEMARIE- FRAN OISE et al., "Very high density of Chinese hamster ovary cells in perfusion by alternating tangential flow or tangential flow filtration in WAVE bioreactor™—part II: Applications for antibody production and cryopreservation", Biotechnology progress, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1002/btpr.1703, pages 768 - 777, XP055168922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.1703 | - BRECHMANN N.A et al., Biotechnol Prog, (20190000), vol. 35, pages 1 - 10 |