EP3954524 - COOLING MOLD, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING RESIN MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO., LTD. 4586-3 Koo Komoro-shi, Nagano 384-8585 / JP | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEHANA, Daisaburo c/o NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO., LTD. 4586-3 Koo Komoro-shi, Nagano 384-8585 / JP | 02 /
MARUYAMA, Yasuhide c/o NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO., LTD. 4586-3 Koo Komoro-shi, Nagano 384-8585 / JP | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20786846.4 | 08.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020JP15844 | Priority number, date | JP20190073501 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019073501 | [2022/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209294 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954524 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3954524 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/72, B29C49/06, B29C49/42, B29C45/73, B29C49/64, // B29K105/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B29C49/6427 (EP,US);
B29C45/73 (US);
B29C45/7207 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/42071 (EP);
B29C49/42077 (EP);
B29C49/42079 (EP,US);
B29C49/42089 (EP);
B29C49/42091 (EP,US);
B29C49/64 (US);
B29C49/648 (EP);
B29C2045/7214 (EP,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/0781 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP);
B29C2949/24 (EP);
B29C2949/26 (EP);
B29C2949/28 (EP);
B29C49/061 (EP);
B29C49/4205 (EP);
B29C49/6465 (EP);
B29C49/6467 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP);
B29L2031/7158 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | B29C45/72, B29C45/73, B29C49/06, B29C49/64, B29C49/42, // B29K105/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/07] | B29C45/72, B29C45/73, B29C49/06, B29C49/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLFORM UND VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HARZFORMARTIKELS | [2022/07] | English: | COOLING MOLD, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING RESIN MOLDED ARTICLE | [2022/07] | French: | MOULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT, ET DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE MOULÉ EN RÉSINE | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | Translation filed | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4592719 (BELLEHACHE PIERRE [FR], et al); | [YA]JP2000158525 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [XAY]DE10215722 (PESAVENTO MODESTO M [DE]); | [XAY]US2006204607 (NETER WITOLD [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2001018274 (HEKUMA HERBST MASCHB GMBH); | [XY]US2006204607 (NETER WITOLD [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012057016 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XA]US2012263820 (THOEMMES HELMUT [DE]) | by applicant | JP2509803B | JP2004521779 | WO2017073791 |