EP3952981 - AN INTELLIGENTLY, CONTINUOUSLY AND PHYSIOLOGICALLY CONTROLLED PACEMAKER AND METHOD OF OPERATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BaroPace, Inc. 124 Manzanita St. Ashland, OR 97520 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Burnam, Michael 124 Manzanita St. Ashland, Oregon 97520 / US | ||
For all designated states Gang, Eli 2633 Zorada Dr. Los Angeles, California 90046 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 20786932.2 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US25447 | Priority number, date | US201962833052P | 12.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962833052 P | WO2019US59703 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: PCT/US2019/059703 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020210060 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952981 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61B5/00, A61N1/365, A61B5/021, A61B5/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/36564 (EP);
A61N1/3702 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H20/40 (US);
A61B5/021 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTER KONTINUIERLICH UND PHYSIOLOGISCH GESTEUERTER SCHRITTMACHER UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/07] | English: | AN INTELLIGENTLY, CONTINUOUSLY AND PHYSIOLOGICALLY CONTROLLED PACEMAKER AND METHOD OF OPERATION OF THE SAME | [2022/07] | French: | STIMULATEUR CARDIAQUE À COMMANDE INTELLIGENTE, CONTINUE ET PHYSIOLOGIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.08.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007260285 (LIBBUS IMAD [US], et al); | [A]US2010312125 (ZHANG HONGXUAN [US]); | [A]US2011213435 (ROM RAMI [IL]) | International search | [A]CA2195018 (GW SCIENT INC [US]) [A] 1-8* , entire document *; | [XYA]US6141590 (RENIRIE ALEXIS C M [NL], et al) [X] 1,6 -7 * , column 3 lines 10-22, column 4 lines 45-65, column 7 lines 10-55, column 8 lines 1-10 * [Y] 2-5 [A] 8; | [A]US2011213435 (ROM RAMI [IL]) [A] 1-8 * , entire document *; | [Y]US9433792 (ROSENBERG STUART [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * , fig. 1, column 1 lines 30-67, column 6 lines 1-65 , column 18 lines 35-67 * |