EP3953417 - AQUEOUS BINDER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Owens-Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, OH 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Gert 8931 Grate Park Square New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiujuan 4533 Redwood Vine Drive New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Liang 7292 Halcyon Place New Albany, Ohio 43054 / US | 04 /
MENDEZ-ANDINO, Jose 4842 Tatersall Court Columbus, Ohio 43230 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20786936.3 | 07.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US26994 | Priority number, date | US201962831222P | 09.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962831222 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020210188 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953417 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/053, D04H1/4209, C09D129/04, C09D133/02, C08K5/17, D04H1/58, D04H1/64, // C08L33/02, C08L29/04 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
D04H1/587 (EP,KR);
C08L29/04 (KR);
C08J5/249 (US);
C08F16/06 (US);
C08J5/244 (US);
C08K5/053 (KR,US);
C08K5/17 (US);
C08L33/02 (KR);
C09D129/04 (EP);
C09D133/02 (EP);
D04H1/4218 (EP);
D04H1/64 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08K5/053, C08L33/02 (EP);
C09D133/02, C08K5/053, C08L29/04 (EP);
C09D133/02, C08K5/17, C08L29/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | C08K5/053, C08K5/092, C08L29/04, D04H1/4209 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/07] | English: | AQUEOUS BINDER COMPOSITIONS | [2022/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS LIANTES AQUEUSES | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US2019106564 (ZHANG XIUJUAN [US], et al); | [XP]WO2019074865 (OWENS CORNING INTELLECTUAL CAPITAL LLC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1-9 * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] *; | [XP]WO2019074867 (OWENS CORNING INTELLECTUAL CAPITAL LLC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1-13 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * | International search | [Y]US5349041 (BLUM HARALD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-33 * entire document *; | [Y]US2004219847 (MILLER WAYNE P [US]) [Y] 1-12, 21-33 * entire document *; | [Y]US2006079629 (TAYLOR THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 13-22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2006252855 (PISANOVA ELENA [CA], et al) [Y] 1-33 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010105272 (NANDI SOUVIK [US], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014186635 (MUELLER GERT [US]) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [PX]US2019106564 (ZHANG XIUJUAN [US], et al) [PX] 1-33* entire document * |