EP3965987 - DRILL COLUMN END SECTION ASSEMBLY FOR A DRILL STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKÖTTE, Karl Norra Liden 23 411 18 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
VIDLUND, Robert Hedlunds backe 7 443 38 Lerum / SE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20787013.0 | 30.03.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020SE50329 | Priority number, date | SE20190050448 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: SE 1950448 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209774 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965987 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965987 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23B45/14, B23B47/00, B23D45/02, B23D47/02, B28D7/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B25H1/0064 (EP,US);
B23B45/003 (SE);
B23D45/022 (SE);
B23D47/02 (SE);
B23Q5/52 (US);
F16B2/065 (SE);
F16M11/06 (SE);
F16M11/18 (EP);
F16M11/2021 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP);
B23B2260/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDSTÜCKANORDNUNG EINER BOHRSÄULE FÜR EINEN BOHRSTÄNDER | [2022/11] | English: | DRILL COLUMN END SECTION ASSEMBLY FOR A DRILL STAND | [2022/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE SECTION D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE PERFORATRICE SUR COLONNE DESTINÉ À UN SUPPORT DE PERFORATRICE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24163653.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3890058 (SELF EDGAR L, et al); | [A]US5150993 (MILLER BERNARD [US]); | [A]US5233891 (ARNOLD ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5797708 (BENCIC STJEPAN [US]); | [A]US2008196560 (HSIEH CHIH-CHING [TW]); | [Y]WO2014205264 (ECA MEDICAL INSTR [US]) | International search | [XA]US2888965 (PHILLIPS CARLETON A); | [A]GB2142472 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE29703685U (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]WO2014070054 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE], et al) |