EP3911992 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY DEVICE AND OPERATING METHOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOO, Bonkon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KO, Jaewoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Wonwoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
KOO, Bonkon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
KO, Jaewoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Wonwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20787395.1 | 17.02.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020KR02225 | Priority number, date | US201962832544P | 11.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962832544 P | KR20190106133 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190106133 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209491 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911992 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B27/00, G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/0346, G06V10/145, G06V20/20, G06V40/18 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06T19/006 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/246 (EP,CN);
G06T7/521 (CN,US);
G06T7/593 (CN,US);
G06T7/75 (EP,CN);
G06V10/145 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (CN,US);
G06V10/94 (EP,CN,US);
G06V20/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B2027/0129 (CN,KR);
G02B2027/0132 (CN,KR);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,CN);
G02B2027/014 (CN,KR);
G02B2027/0178 (EP,CN,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,CN);
G06T2207/10028 (CN,US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,CN);
G06T2215/16 (US);
G06T2219/004 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAVON | [2021/47] | English: | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY DEVICE AND OPERATING METHOD OF THE SAME | [2021/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VISIOCASQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006197832 (YAMADA SHOJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0192]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0225] *; | [IP]US10349194 (HOFFMAN PABLO FRANCISCO FAUNDEZ [US], et al) [IP] 1-20 * column 21, line 19 - column 21, line 45; figures 9,10 *; | [A] - FU-SONG HSU ET AL, "Human-oriented interaction with a TOF sensor", NETWORK OF ERGONOMICS SOCIETIES CONFERENCE (SEANES), 2012 SOUTHEAST ASIAN, IEEE, (20120709), doi:10.1109/SEANES.2012.6299581, ISBN 978-1-4673-1732-0, pages 1 - 5, XP032235485 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * Section I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SEANES.2012.6299581 | International search | [AY]US2016027215 (BURNS AARON [US], et al) [A] 6,10,16,19 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0038], claim 1 and figures 5-11. * [Y] 1-5,7-9,11-15,17-18,20; | [Y]US2016234482 (BICKERSTAFF IAN HENRY [GB], et al) [Y] 4-5,7-9,14-15,17-18 * See paragraph [0109], claim 13 and figures 24-26. *; | [Y]US2017075421 (NA YUN-CHUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 8,18 * See paraagraph [0049] and figure 1A. *; | [Y]US2017160518 (LANMAN DOUGLAS ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11-15,17-18,20 * See paragraph [0026], claim 1 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2019012771 (PINES JOSHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See claim 1 and figures 2-3. * | by applicant | US2006197832 | - FU-SONG HSU et al., "Human-oriented interaction with a TOF sensor", Network of Ergonomics Societies Conference (SEANES), 2012 Southeast Asian IEEE, (20120709), doi:10.1109/SEANES.2012.6299581, pages 1 - 5, XP032272569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SEANES.2012.6299581 |