Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3952727 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3952727



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(36)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 311
03.04.2025 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.04.2025 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.04.2025 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.04.2025 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.04.2025 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 39
03.04.2025 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 39
21.03.2025 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.08.2024 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.06.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.06.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.06.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.06.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
15.06.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.06.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2022 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.11.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.11.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 6
30.11.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
30.11.2022 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
11.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.04.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.04.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2022 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.11.2021 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.10.2021 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.09.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2021 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.08.2021 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
02.11.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 59
15.10.2020 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.10.2020 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 41