EP3952803 - COOLING AND REFRIGERATION BASED ON VACUUM-DRIVEN WATER EVAPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arktikus LLC C/o Cambridge Technology Law LLC P.O. Box 590638 Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'CONNOR, John 4 LaMancha Way An Dover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | 02 /
O'CONNOR, Cindy 4 LaMancha Way An Dover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | 03 /
SHEETS, Ellen 505 Tremont St., 803 Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20787730.9 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020IB53449 | Priority number, date | US201962832257P | 10.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962832257 P | US201962859767P | 11.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962859767 P | US201962880189P | 30.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962880189 P | US202062969876P | 04.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062969876 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020208604 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952803 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/00, A61B18/02, A61B18/00, A61F7/12, A61F7/02, F24F5/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
F24F5/0035 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/0218 (EP,KR,US);
A61F7/0085 (EP,KR,US);
A61F7/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00291 (EP,KR);
A61B2018/00464 (EP,KR);
A61B2018/00482 (EP,KR);
A61B2018/00541 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,KR);
A61F2007/0052 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2007/0063 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2007/0068 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2007/0069 (EP,KR);
A61F2007/0239 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | A61F7/00, A61B18/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | ABKÜHLUNG UND KÜHLUNG BASIEREND AUF VAKUUMGESTEUERTER WASSERVERDAMPFUNG | [2022/07] | English: | COOLING AND REFRIGERATION BASED ON VACUUM-DRIVEN WATER EVAPORATION | [2022/07] | French: | REFROIDISSEMENT ET RÉFRIGÉRATION BASÉS SUR UNE ÉVAPORATION D'EAU COMMANDÉE PAR LE VIDE | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009234325 (ROZENBERG ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 7* paragraph [0179] *; | [X]US2014116081 (RITCHIE MICHAEL CHARLES [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2018317344 (PARNES TAL [IL], et al) [X] 1-11,14-21 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0061] *; | [X]CN109489160 (UNIV XIAN POLYTECHNIC) [X] 1,12,13 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5423807 (MILDER FREDRIC L [US]) [X] 1, 3-7, 11-15, 18, 21-26, 30-34, 37, 40-45, 49-54, 57-62, 66-70 * Entire document *; | [A]US2015297279 (CLARKE BRIAN [GB]) [A] 1-70* Entire document *; | [A]CA2849828 (SAVARD DANIEL G [CA]) [A] 1-70 * Entire document *; | [X]US2018317344 (PARNES TAL [IL], et al) [X] 1-10, 16-29, 35-48, 54-65 * Entire document * |