EP3953112 - CABLE ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RBOT9 INC. 390 place Orchard Saint-Bruno-de-Montarville, Québec J3V 2N3 / CA | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACHON, Frédéric 390 place Orchard Saint-Bruno-de-Montarville Québec J3V 2N3 / CA | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20787771.3 | 07.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020CA50457 | Priority number, date | US201962830783P | 08.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962830783 P | US201962931979P | 07.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931979 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206532 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953112 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.10.2020 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J11/00, B25J5/00, B25J9/18 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
B25J9/0078 (EP,KR);
B25J9/1045 (KR,US);
B25J11/00 (KR,US);
B25J5/02 (KR);
B25J9/0018 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | KABELROBOTER | [2022/07] | English: | CABLE ROBOT | [2022/07] | French: | ROBOT À CÂBLES | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 08.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5585707 (THOMPSON CLARK J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005013195 (RODNUNSKY JIM [US], et al); | [Y]EP3318369 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [E]WO2020198862 (KHAJEPOUR AMIR [CA], et al); | International search | [A]US2009066100 (BOSSCHER PAUL M [US], et al); | [A]CN108582034 (OCEAN UNIV CHINA) | by applicant | US6809495 | DE102008013729 | US7753642 |