EP3954628 - MULTILAYER FILM FOR CONTAINER AND CONTAINER COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hosokawa Yoko Co., Ltd. 11-5, Niban-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0084 / JP | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAWAKI Ryosuke c/o HOSOKAWA YOKO CO., LTD., 11-5, Niban-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0084 / JP | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20787978.4 | 07.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020JP15647 | Priority number, date | JP20190074850 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019074850 | [2022/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209247 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954628 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, A61J1/10, B32B27/32, B65D81/24, C09J7/24, C09J7/35, C09J123/04, C09J125/08, B32B7/02, B32B7/027 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C09J123/14 (EP);
B65D75/26 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/325 (US);
B32B27/327 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (EP);
B32B7/027 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP);
C09J7/24 (EP);
C09J7/35 (EP);
A61J1/10 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (US);
B32B2250/246 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2274/00 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2307/738 (EP);
B32B2439/46 (EP,US);
B32B2439/80 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C09J2301/208 (EP);
C09J2301/304 (EP);
C09J2423/00 (EP);
C09J2423/006 (EP);
C09J2423/04 (EP);
C09J2425/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | B65D65/40, A61J1/10, B32B27/32, B65D81/24, C09J7/24, C09J7/35, C09J123/04, C09J125/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE FÜR BEHÄLTER UND BEHÄLTER DAMIT | [2022/07] | English: | MULTILAYER FILM FOR CONTAINER AND CONTAINER COMPRISING SAME | [2022/07] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE POUR RÉCIPIENT ET RÉCIPIENT LE COMPRENANT | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2021 | Translation filed | 04.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11137241 (OTSUKA TECHNO KK, et al); | [Y]JP2010201648 (KASEI CO C I) | International search | [Y]JPH11137241 (OTSUKA TECHNO KK, et al); | [A]JP2003237002 (SHOWA DENKO PLASTIC PROD CO); | [Y]JP2012030497 (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK); | [A]JP2012201392 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [Y]JP2013018211 (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK); | [A]JP2015070092 (GUNZE KK) | by applicant | WO2014196594 | JP2019074850 |