EP3955202 - EQUIPMENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMALLY MANAGING ENERGY IN A NETWORK FOR DOMESTIC AND INDUSTRIAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad Adolfo Ibañez Av. Diagonal Las Torres 2700 Peñalolen Santiago / CL | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRASCO SCHMIDT, Rodrigo Hermanos Cabot 7393 Las Condes, Santiago / CL | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | De Vidal Gonzalez, Maria Ester Bird & Bird International LLP Paseo de la Castellana 7, 7º Planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20788010.5 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020CL50029 | Priority number, date | CL201920190938 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: CL 20190938 | [2022/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206565 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | ES | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955202 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CL | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/06, H02J13/00, H02J3/00, H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP);
G05B19/042 (US);
H02J13/00002 (EP);
H02J3/003 (EP);
H02J3/004 (EP);
H02J3/381 (EP);
G05B2219/2639 (US);
H02J2203/20 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (EP);
H02J2310/12 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | G06Q50/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMALEN ENERGIEVERWALTUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK FÜR HEIM- UND INDUSTRIEANWENDUNGEN | [2022/07] | English: | EQUIPMENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMALLY MANAGING ENERGY IN A NETWORK FOR DOMESTIC AND INDUSTRIAL USE | [2022/07] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR DE MANIÈRE OPTIMALE DE L'ÉNERGIE DANS UN RÉSEAU À USAGE À DOMICILE ET INDUSTRIEL | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | Translation filed | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 05.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018055594 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1* paragraphs [0013] , [0031] , [0042] *; | [X]US2018226800 (BHATTARAI BISHNU P [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] , [0028] , [0039] - [0041] - [0043] - [0046] - [0053]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP5278462B (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 6 * . Parrafos [003], [018], [032]-[034], [039], [040], [043], [061]; cláusula 1. *; | JP5278462B [ ]; | [Y]US9772643 (STEVEN ALAIN P [US], et al) [Y] 12-21 * . Col. 5, 7, 8, 25, 26, 28, 31-36, 41, 42, 47, 52-56, 57, 61; figs. 11, 12; cláusulas 1, 7, 22; ec. 17. *; | [Y]US2018054070 (KRISHNAMOORTHY SUDARSHAN [US], et al) [Y] 6 * . Parrafos [053], [075], [076], [090], [091]; figs. 2, 3, 9. *; | [A]WO2019005412 (MERIT SI LLC [US]) [A] * 03 ENERO 2019 [028], [031], [034], [042], [043], [047]; fig. 6; cláusula 1. *; | [XY]US10223656 (KOPP PHILLIP [US]) [X] 1-5, 7, 8, 10 * . Col. 2, 6, 8, 9, 11, 12-14, 16, 19-24; fig. 2. * [Y] 6, 12-21 | by applicant | US2006027638 |