blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3955415

EP3955415 - POWER MANAGEMENT DEVICE, POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.01.2022
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.10.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2022/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KUSANO, Yoshimasa
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / AZUMA, Kazuaki
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
03 / HIROSE, Masahiko
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
04 / IBARAKI, Kyouichi
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
 [2022/07]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2022/07]
Application number, filing date20788386.909.04.2020
[2022/07]
WO2020JP15924
Priority number, dateJP2019007654212.04.2019         Original published format: JP 2019076542
JP2019009542421.05.2019         Original published format: JP 2019095424
[2022/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020209323
Date:15.10.2020
Language:JA
[2020/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3955415
Date:16.02.2022
Language:EN
[2022/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.10.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2023
ClassificationIPC:H02J3/32, H02J3/38, H02J13/00, B60L53/66, B60L53/68, // H02J7/35
[2023/11]
CPC:
H02J3/381 (EP,US); B60L53/665 (EP); B60L53/68 (EP);
G05B15/02 (US); H02J13/00002 (US); H02J13/00004 (EP);
H02J13/00006 (US); H02J3/008 (EP); H02J3/322 (EP);
B60L53/66 (US); H02J2300/24 (EP,US); H02J7/35 (EP);
Y02E10/56 (EP); Y02E60/00 (EP); Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP); Y02T90/12 (EP); Y02T90/16 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP); Y04S10/126 (EP); Y04S30/12 (EP);
Y04S30/14 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2022/07]H02J13/00, G06Q50/06, H02J3/00, H02J3/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/07]
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN[2022/07]
English:POWER MANAGEMENT DEVICE, POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD[2022/07]
French:DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE[2022/07]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2021Translation filed 
02.11.2021National basic fee paid 
02.11.2021Search fee paid 
02.11.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2021Examination requested  [2022/07]
07.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2015048800  (HIRNING MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-5* paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0030]; figures 1-2 *;
 [X]DE102014213248  (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0033] , [0035] , [0036] , [0038] , [0043] , [0044] , [0048]; figure 1 *
International search[XY]JP2013153610  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * paragraphs [0013]-[0057], fig. 1-7 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]JP2015186277  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 3* paragraphs [0064]-[0079], fig. 7-11 *
by applicantJP2011180791
 JP2019076542
 JP2019095424
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.