EP3952992 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR GENDER-DEPENDENT TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55905 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Jordan D. 3753 Mayo Woodlands Rd SW Rochester, Minnesota 55902-3636 / US | 02 /
ENRIQUEZ-SARANO, Maurice E. 2533 NE Hawthorn Hill Road Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Bin 1637 9th Ave NE Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 04 /
ROOS, Carolyn Marie 715 15th Ave NE Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20788569.0 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US27777 | Priority number, date | US201962832139P | 10.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962832139 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020210707 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952992 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61K31/635, A61K45/06 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/635 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/197 (KR);
A61K31/416 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P9/12 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61P9/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR GESCHLECHTSABHÄNGIGEN BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄRER DYSFUNKTION | [2022/07] | English: | METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR GENDER-DEPENDENT TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DYSFUNCTION | [2022/07] | French: | MÉTHODES ET MATÉRIELS DE TRAITEMENT DÉPENDANT DU SEXE DE DYSFONCTIONNEMENT CARDIOVASCULAIRE | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014100733 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * examples 1-7; claims 1-8 *; | [A] - E.S. BUYS ET AL, "Discovery and development of next generation sGC stimulators with diverse multidimensional pharmacology and broad therapeutic potential", NITRIC OXIDE: BIOLOGY AND CHEMISTRY., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180801), vol. 78, doi:10.1016/j.niox.2018.05.009, ISSN 1089-8603, pages 72 - 80, XP055529358 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2018.05.009 | International search | [A]US2011028493 (MATSUNAGA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3, 6-9, 12-14, 17-23, 26-29, 32-34, 37-43, 47-49, 51* entire document *; | [A]WO2013030564 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) [A] 1-3, 6-9, 12-14, 17-23, 26-29, 32-34, 37-43, 47-49, 51 * entire document *; | [A]US2018071320 (MILLER JORDAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 6-9, 12-14, 17-23, 26-29, 32-34, 37-43, 47-49, 51 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2018064490 (XENAMED CORP [US]) [Y] 41-43 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2018112258 (RESPIRA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 41-43 * entire document * |