blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3954190

EP3954190 - IMAGE ACQUISITION DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD FOR AGRICULTURAL HARVESTING OPERATION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2025
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.01.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.10.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FJ Dynamics Technology Co., Ltd
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District
Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
[2022/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEN, Yongquan
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
02 / WANG, Bo
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
03 / FAN, Shun
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
04 / WU, Di
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
05 / YAO, Yuan
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
06 / ZHANG, Xiao
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
07 / CHEN, Rui
No. 1, Dongfeng Jingguan Avenue
International Logistics Park
Xiangzhou District Xiangyang, Hubei 441100 / CN
 [2022/07]
Representative(s)Zaboliene, Reda
Metida
Business center Vertas
Gyneju str. 16
01109 Vilnius / LT
[2022/07]
Application number, filing date20788625.020.03.2020
[2022/07]
WO2020CN80322
Priority number, dateCN20191028037509.04.2019         Original published format: CN201910280375
CN201920473543U09.04.2019         Original published format: CN 201920473543 U
[2022/07]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020207225
Date:15.10.2020
Language:ZH
[2020/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3954190
Date:16.02.2022
Language:EN
[2022/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.10.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:A01B69/00, A01D41/02, A01D41/127
[2023/01]
CPC:
A01D41/1278 (EP); A01D41/127 (US); A01B69/001 (EP);
A01B79/005 (US); A01D41/02 (EP); G05D1/0246 (US)
Former IPC [2022/07]A01D41/02, A01D41/12, G05D1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/07]
TitleGerman:BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ERNTEVORGANGSMASCHINE[2022/07]
English:IMAGE ACQUISITION DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD FOR AGRICULTURAL HARVESTING OPERATION MACHINE[2022/07]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT POUR MACHINE AGRICOLE POUR DES OPÉRATIONS DE RÉCOLTE[2022/07]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2021Translation filed 
08.11.2021National basic fee paid 
08.11.2021Search fee paid 
08.11.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2021Examination requested  [2022/07]
20.06.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2025Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2010029135  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH);
 [A]US2011072773  (SCHROEDER JAY DAVID [US], et al);
 [X]JP2015070799  (YANMAR CO LTD);
 [XI]CN105682446  (YANMAR CO LTD);
 [A]JP2018186728  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH);
 [A]US2019021226  (DIMA CRISTIAN [DE], et al)
International search[A]JP2010029135  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-26 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011072773  (SCHROEDER JAY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *;
 [X]CN105682446  (YANMAR CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 7-8, 10, 16-20 * description, paragraphs [0079]-[0169], figures 1-14 *;
 [Y]CN105682446  (YANMAR CO LTD) [Y] 6, 9, 11-15, 21-26 * description, paragraphs [0079]-[0169], figures 1-14 *;
 [Y]CN105991929  (HAOYUN TECH CO LTD) [Y] 6, 9, 11-15, 21-26 * description, paragraphs [0041]-[0077], figures 5-6 *;
 [PX]CN110209155  (FJ DYNAMICS TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-2, 5, 7-8 * claims 1-2, 5, 7-8 *;
 [PX]CN210130123U  (FJ DYNAMICS TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-2, 5, 7-8 * description, paragraphs [0053]-[0081], figures 1-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.