EP4051637 - ELECTRODE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOIT, Severin Neußer Straße 3 52441 Linnich / DE | 02 /
DE HAART, L.G.J. Schepenbankstraat 3 6291 EA Vaals / NL | 03 /
VIBHU, Vaibhav Artilleriestraße 72 52428 Jülich / DE | 04 /
EICHEL, Rüdiger-a. Schlehdornweg 8 52428 Jülich / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Schwenderling, Jens KEENWAY Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 103363 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20788769.6 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP78132 | Priority number, date | DE201910129070 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019129070 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083624 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051637 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, H01M4/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
C01G53/006 (EP);
C25B11/042 (US);
C01G53/68 (EP);
H01M4/9025 (EP);
C01P2002/34 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2022/36] | English: | ELECTRODE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF SAME | [2022/36] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006255310 (FUNAHASHI RYOJI [JP]) [X] 1-6,14 * page 1, paragraph 52 - page 3; examples 26,27,69,70,91,116,117,541; claim -; tables 1,3,4,5,22 * [I] 7-13,15; | [A]WO2017075429 (LG FUEL CELL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0034] , [0040]; example -; claim - *; | [XI] - BERGER CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of the novel K2NiF4-type oxide Pr2Ni0.9Co0.1O4+[delta]", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, (20180104), vol. 316, doi:10.1016/J.SSI.2017.12.024, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 93 - 101, XP085352791 [X] 1-7,14,15 * page 93 - pages 98,100; figure - * [I] 8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssi.2017.12.024 | [XI] - ALEJANDRA MONTENEGRO-HERNNDEZ ET AL, "Thermal stability of LnNiO(Ln: La, Pr, Nd) and their chemical compatibility with YSZ and CGO solid electrolytes", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., BARKING, GB, vol. 36, no. 24, doi:10.1016/J.IJHYDENE.2011.08.105, ISSN 0360-3199, (20110820), pages 15704 - 15714, (20110908), XP028320666 [X] 1-5,14,15 * page 15704 - page 15707 * * page 15710 - page 15713; figure -; table - * [I] 6-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2011.08.105 | [XI] - V. VAIBHAV ET.AL., "Electrochemical ageing study of mixed lanthanum/praseodymium nickelates La2-xPrxNiO4+delta as oxygen electrodes for solid oxide fuel or electrolysis cellst", JOURNAL OF ENERGY CHEMISTRY, (20191024), vol. 46, doi:10.1016/j.jechem.2019.10.012, pages 62 - 70, XP002801858 [X] 1-5,14,15 * page 62 - pages 64,69 * [I] 6-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jechem.2019.10.012 | by applicant | WO2008061782 | US7803348 | US2012064433 | WO2017214152 |