EP4045186 - LAB-ON-A-CHIP WITH ELECTRONICALLY-CONTROLLED MECHANICAL FLUID DRIVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biothink Technologies S.L. Calle Isaac Newton 4, Planta 1, Oeste 41092 Sevilla / ES | [2024/21] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Biothink Technologies S.L. Calle Leonardo da Vinci 18, Planta 5, Módulo 2 41020 Sevilla / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCO GONZÁLEZ, Emilio Calle Leonardo da Vinci 18, Planta 5, Módulo 2 41020 SEVILLA / ES | 02 /
MOZO MULERO, Marta Calle Leonardo da Vinci 18, Planta 5, Módulo 2 41020 SEVILLA / ES | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [2024/03] |
Former [2022/34] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 20788837.1 | 15.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020EP79070 | Priority number, date | EP20190382911 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19382911 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074310 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045186 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4045186 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L2200/027 (EP,US);
B01L2200/143 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP);
B01L2300/0672 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP);
B01L2300/0874 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAB-ON-A-CHIP MIT ELEKTRONISCH GESTEUERTEM MECHANISCHEM FLUIDANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2022/34] | English: | LAB-ON-A-CHIP WITH ELECTRONICALLY-CONTROLLED MECHANICAL FLUID DRIVING SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | LABORATOIRE SUR PUCE COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE FLUIDE MÉCANIQUE À COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/34] | LABORATOIRE SUR PUCE AVEC SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE FLUIDE MÉCANIQUE À COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 17.01.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | RS | 17.04.2024 | |
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9317328 (DREW SCIENT LTD [GB]); | [XY]WO9926071 (ABION OHG [DE], et al); | [X]US2007245810 (CARTER CHAD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2019070603 (PERDIGONES SANCHEZ FRANCISCO ANTONIO [ES], et al) | Examination | US2011020182 | DE102015002000 | WO2017084766 | US2018010167 | US2018043358 | CN109266518 | EP3683297 |