EP4042369 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF EVALUATING FLUID AND AIR FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materialise NV Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOROZHUK, Oleksandr Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20788953.6 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US52567 | Priority number, date | US201962905814P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905814 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062045 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042369 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/62, A61B6/03, A61B6/00, G16H50/30, A61F2/24, A61B34/10 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B6/469 (EP);
A61B6/504 (EP);
A61B6/507 (EP);
G06T7/62 (EP);
A61B2034/104 (EP);
A61F2/24 (EP);
G06T2207/10072 (EP);
G06T2207/20096 (EP);
G06T2207/20104 (EP);
G06T2207/30048 (EP);
G06T2207/30052 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSWERTEN VON FLUID- UND LUFTSTROM | [2022/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF EVALUATING FLUID AND AIR FLOW | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION D'UN FLUX DE LIQUIDE ET D'AIR | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017220760 (FONTE TIMOTHY A [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract, Figs. 1-42, [0001-0490], claims 31-50 *; | [X]US2017224300 (ISHII HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract, Figs. 1-9, [0001-0113], claims 1-11 *; | [X]US2018161103 (WANG DEE DEE [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract, Figs. 1-14c, [0001-0082], claims 1-33 *; | [X]US2019267142 (WEKEL TILMAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-20* abstract, Figs. 1-10, claims 1-14, [0001-0121] * |