EP4041506 - HAIR-CUTTING UNIT FOR USE IN A HAIR-CUTTING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIEST, Mike c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PRAGT, Johan c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KLEIN HORSMAN, Martijn Dirk c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
JENKINS, Michael Reece c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20789011.2 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP77278 | Priority number, date | EP20190202866 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19202866 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069263 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041506 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4041506 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/14 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B26B19/145 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B26B19/143 (US);
B26B19/3806 (CN);
B26B19/388 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARSCHNEIDEEINHEIT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM HAARSCHNEIDEGERÄT | [2022/33] | English: | HAIR-CUTTING UNIT FOR USE IN A HAIR-CUTTING APPLIANCE | [2022/33] | French: | UNITÉ DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN APPAREIL DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX | [2023/02] |
Former [2022/33] | UNITÉ DE COUPE DES CHEVEUX DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UNE TONDEUSE À CHEVEUX | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 11.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3233323 (JOSEF DRIESSEN HENRICUS) [A] 1-15* column 2, lines 27-66; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0329244 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 56; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0484795 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-7 * |