EP4045981 - METHOD FOR A MODEL-BASED DETERMINATION FOR PROCESSING AN ORDER REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKMANN, Martin Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 02 /
BUSSMANN, Markus Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 03 /
SCHUH, Melanie Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 04 /
EDERLEH, Lennart Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20789073.2 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020EP78237 | Priority number, date | DE201910127549 | 14.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019127549 | [2022/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021073998 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045981 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04, G05B19/418 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G05B13/027 (EP,US);
G05B13/042 (US);
G05B19/40937 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MODELLBASIERTE BESTIMMUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINER AUFTRAGSANFRAGE | [2022/34] | English: | METHOD FOR A MODEL-BASED DETERMINATION FOR PROCESSING AN ORDER REQUEST | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION BASÉE SUR UN MODÈLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE DEMANDE DE COMMANDE | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 16.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1441268 (PAVILION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] - [0041] *; | [XYI]WO2018072773 (REIFENHAEUSER MASCH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7-10 * page 1 - page 10 * * page 28 - page 37 * * page 46 - page 48 * * page 58 - page 60 * * claims 1,4,9,30-31 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 6; | [YA] - DRESSLER-SCHROEDER R ET AL, "EINBINDUNG VON SIMULATIONSTECHNIKEN IN DIE BETRIEBLICHEN ABLAEUFE IN DER SPINNEREI", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, DEUTSCHER FACHVERLAG, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, DE, (19981201), vol. 79, no. 11/12, ISSN 0341-0781, XP000791972 [Y] 2,3 * 1. Probleme der Kalkulation und Auftragsterminierung 2.2. Lösungsbeschreibung 3.2 Zuordnung der Maschinen 3.3. Eintakten der Aufträge 5. Zusammenfassung * [A] 1,4-10 |