Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11659560 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2021099980 | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220067540 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | WO2020US52044 | 22.09.2020 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114424490B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2024 | B | CN114424490 | 29.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | WO2020US52044 | 22.09.2020 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4038790 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | WO2020US52044 | 22.09.2020 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022005306 | 14.06.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | WO2020US52044 | 22.09.2020 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021067073 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202131731 | 16.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201941039480 | 30.09.2019 | US202017027337 | 21.09.2020 |