EP4034623 - HIGH ALKALINE SOLVENT-BASED DEGREASER AND CLEANER WITH DIUTAN GUM AS A PRIMARY THICKENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMIRU, Hilina c/o Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place Saint Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | 02 /
WALTERS, Kerrie E. c/o Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place Saint Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | 03 /
FAUBION, Madeline G. c/o Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place Saint Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20789370.2 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US52629 | Priority number, date | US201962906216P | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962906216 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062091 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034623 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/04, C11D3/08, C11D3/22, C11D3/43 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C11D3/1253 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
B08B3/08 (US);
B08B9/00 (US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (US);
C11D3/044 (EP,US);
C11D3/1266 (US);
C11D3/2086 (US);
C11D3/3463 (US);
C11D3/3707 (US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D2111/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | HOCHALKALISCHES ENTFETTUNGS- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL AUF LÖSUNGSMITTELBASIS UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT DIUTANGUMMI ALS PRIMÄRES VERDICKUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/31] | English: | HIGH ALKALINE SOLVENT-BASED DEGREASER AND CLEANER WITH DIUTAN GUM AS A PRIMARY THICKENING SYSTEM | [2022/31] | French: | DÉGRAISSANT ET NETTOYANT À BASE DE SOLVANT HAUTEMENT ALCALIN RENFERMANT DE LA GOMME DE DIUTANE EN TANT QUE SYSTÈME ÉPAISSISSANT PRINCIPAL | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2003100460 (WINSTON PHILIP E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0011]; claim - * [A] 14-24[I] 6,7,10,11; | [XA]US2016288091 (FUKUSHIMA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 25,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0022] * [A] 1-24 |