EP4049443 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CAMERA MODULE, CAMERA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Moritz Leopoldstr. 5 76337 Waldbronn / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Nikolai Henry-Dunant-Str. 24 71696 Moeglingen / DE | 03 /
MOEHRLE, Andreas Bergstrasse 6 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20789963.4 | 12.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020EP78536 | Priority number, date | DE201910216283 | 23.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019216283 | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021078548 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049443 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4049443 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/00, G02B7/02, G02B27/62, H04N23/55, G02B27/00, G02B13/16 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G02B7/003 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,CN,KR);
G02B7/02 (CN);
G02B13/16 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0006 (EP,KR);
G02B27/62 (EP,CN,KR);
G02B7/022 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B7/023 (EP,CN);
G02B7/026 (EP,CN,KR);
G02B7/028 (EP,KR);
G03B17/12 (CN);
G03B30/00 (CN);
H04N23/54 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H04N5/225, G02B7/00, G02B7/02, G02B27/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KAMERAMODULS, KAMERAMODUL | [2022/35] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CAMERA MODULE, CAMERA MODULE | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET MODULE DE CAMÉRA | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2011298968 (TSENG JEFFREY SHIE PING [US], et al); | [IA]US2015172521 (YASUKOCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE102015225794 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2017339323 (DROTLEFF HANS-GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US2019052782 (SUNG JAE HUN [KR], et al) |