EP4045290 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) OBJECT EMPLOYING GRANULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/45] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARBTER, Rene Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
STAUDT, Thorsten Martin Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SEILER, Rudolf Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
STEINKE, Oleg Portugieserring 3 67167 Erpolzheim / DE | 05 /
SCHWENDY, Sascha Tim Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2022/34] | Ellwanger, Arndt Ellwanger & Baier Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20789979.0 | 13.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020EP78744 | Priority number, date | EP20190203927 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19203927 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074129 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045290 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4045290 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/106, B29C64/118, B29C64/321, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, C04B35/01, C04B35/053, C04B35/057, C04B35/111, C04B35/14, C04B35/486, C04B35/505, C04B35/565, C04B35/58, C04B35/622, C04B35/581, C04B35/587, C04B35/626, B22F1/103 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B29C64/106 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C64/118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F1/103 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/64 (US);
B22F12/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B28B1/001 (US);
B29C48/0022 (KR);
B29C48/05 (KR);
B29C48/288 (KR);
B29C48/50 (KR);
B29C48/505 (KR);
B29C64/165 (KR);
B29C64/209 (KR);
B29C64/255 (KR,US);
B29C64/295 (KR);
B29C64/321 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y40/00 (KR);
B33Y40/20 (US);
B33Y70/00 (KR);
B33Y70/10 (EP,CN,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/01 (EP,CN);
C04B35/053 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/057 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/111 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/14 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/486 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/505 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/565 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/58071 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/581 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/587 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/622 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/62695 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B35/63472 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C47/14 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C49/14 (EP,CN,KR);
B22F2301/35 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,CN,KR);
B29K2023/00 (KR);
B29K2075/00 (KR,US);
B29K2105/251 (US);
B29K2505/00 (KR);
B29K2509/02 (KR);
B29K2995/0094 (US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B2235/5296 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/18, B22F10/64 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/64, B22F3/1021 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/34] | B29C64/106, B29C64/118, B29C64/321, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, C04B35/01, C04B35/053, C04B35/057, C04B35/111, C04B35/14, C04B35/486, C04B35/505, C04B35/565, C04B35/58, C04B35/622, C04B35/581, C04B35/587, C04B35/626, C04B35/634 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN (3D) OBJEKTS MIT GRANULATEN | [2022/34] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) OBJECT EMPLOYING GRANULATES | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN OBJET EN TROIS DIMENSIONS (3D) UTILISANT DES GRANULÉS | [2023/22] |
Former [2022/34] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL (3D) EMPLOYANT DES GRANULÉS | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 08.11.2023 | |
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 08.11.2023 | |
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2015321419 (LINTHICUM TODD [US], et al); | [AD]WO2016012486 (BASF SE [DE]); | [A]EP3112133 (YUYAMA SEIICHI [JP]); | [X]WO2019079704 (MARKFORGED INC [US]); | [A]WO2019116088 (BRASKEM SA [BR]); | [XA]CN110315746 (SHENZHEN CHANGXING ADDITIVE TECH CO LTD) |