Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024116109 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220083739 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023501890 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114585495 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4045290 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | C0 | EP4045290 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | B1 | EP4045290 | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2970347T | 28.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 | WO2020EP78744 | 13.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021074129 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19203927 | 17.10.2019 |