EP4045175 - COMPOSITE, ZONED OXIDATION CATALYST FOR A COMPRESSION IGNITION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25, Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIFFEY, Andrew Francis Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 02 /
COLE, Kieran Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 03 /
COOPER, Oliver Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 04 /
DALY, Christopher Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 05 /
GILBERT, Lee Alexander Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 06 /
HANLEY, Robert Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 07 /
MICALLEF, David Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertforrdshire SG8 5HE / GB | 08 /
MOREAU, Francois Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 09 /
PHILLIPS, Paul Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 10 /
PLATT, George Johnson Matthey PLC Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Johnson Matthey Plc Intellectual Property Department Belasis Avenue Billingham TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Nunn, Andrew Dominic, et al Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 20790383.2 | 13.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020GB52547 | Priority number, date | EP20190203640 | 16.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19203640 | GB20200004769 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004769 | GB20200009825 | 26.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202009825 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074605 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045175 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4045175 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/58, B01J35/00, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, B01J37/03, F01N3/10, B01J23/40, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, F01N3/28, F01N13/00, B01J23/63, F01N3/021, F01N3/24 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B01D53/944 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/94 (GB);
B01J35/19 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/84 (US);
B01D53/9472 (US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,KR);
B01J21/12 (US);
B01J23/10 (US);
B01J23/34 (US);
B01J23/40 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/42 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/44 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J29/76 (US);
B01J35/00 (GB);
B01J35/394 (US);
B01J35/647 (US);
B01J37/02 (GB);
B01J37/0228 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J37/0234 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J37/0244 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J37/03 (GB);
F01N13/009 (EP,KR);
F01N3/021 (EP,KR,US);
F01N3/10 (GB);
F01N3/103 (EP,KR,US);
F01N3/106 (CN);
F01N3/24 (EP);
F01N3/2803 (CN);
F01N3/281 (EP,KR);
F01N3/2828 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/903 (KR);
B01D2255/9032 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9035 (EP);
B01D2255/9037 (EP);
B01D2255/9155 (US);
B01D2255/9202 (US);
B01D2255/9207 (US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2330/48 (US);
F01N2370/04 (US);
F01N2510/06 (EP,CN);
F01N2510/063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01N2510/0682 (EP,CN,KR);
F01N2510/0684 (EP,CN,KR);
Y02A50/20 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/12 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | B01D53/94, B01J23/58, B01J35/00, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, B01J37/03, F01N3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTER ZONENOXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSIONSZÜNDUNGSVERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2023/31] | English: | COMPOSITE, ZONED OXIDATION CATALYST FOR A COMPRESSION IGNITION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2022/34] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION À ZONES COMPOSÉ POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE À ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION | [2023/31] |
Former [2022/34] | VERBUNDWERKSTOFF, ZONENOXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSIONSZÜNDUNGSVERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | ||
Former [2022/34] | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION À ZONES, COMPOSITE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE À ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 05.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23198352.9 / EP4283100 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2014151677 (BASF CORP [US]) [Y] 1-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0020] - [0023] - [0038] , [0041] , [0043] , [0050] - [0053] - [0056] , [0074] , [0080] - [0083] * * figures 3a,3b * * examples 6,12 * * claims 1,7,9,10,11,14 * [A] 7,8,15; | [YA]EP2051799 (BASF CORP [US]) [Y] 1-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * [A] 7,8,15; | [A]EP3170553 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0012] , [0126] - [0146] * * figure 5 ** examples 5,6 * | by applicant | EP0341832 | US5045519 | WO9947260 | EP1077769 | WO2006056811 | WO2007077462 | EP2000639 | EP2051799 | WO2009076574 | WO2009080155 | WO2010118125 | WO2011080525 | WO2013088152 | WO2014080200 | WO2014080202 | WO2014132034 | WO2014151677 | WO2015015182 | WO2015110818 | EP3170553 | WO2017093720 | - C. RUEHL et al., Environ. Sci. Technol, (20180000), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 5868 - 5874 | - A.J.J. WILKINS et al., Platinum Metals Review, (19900000), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 16 - 24 | EP20190182733 |