EP3956570 - DOWEL WITH DIRECTIONAL EXPANDING PORTION AND WALL SYSTEM INCLUDING DIRECTIONAL DOWEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miller Dowel Company 1000 Skokie Blvd. Suite 555 Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Michael, R. 246 Scott Ave. Winnetka, IL 60093 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20791206.4 | 15.06.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US37761 | Priority number, date | US202016842450 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US202016842450 | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/08] | US201962836219P | 19.04.2019 | |
US202016842450 | 07.04.2020 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020215099 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956570 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/02, E04B1/48, F16B12/24, F16B13/14 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP);
F16B13/04 (CN,US);
F16B12/24 (EP);
F16B13/02 (US);
A47B2230/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | DÜBEL MIT GERICHTETEM SPREIZTEIL UND WANDSYSTEM MIT EINEM GERICHTETEN DÜBEL | [2022/08] | English: | DOWEL WITH DIRECTIONAL EXPANDING PORTION AND WALL SYSTEM INCLUDING DIRECTIONAL DOWEL | [2022/08] | French: | GOUJON À PARTIE EXTENSIBLE DIRECTIONNELLE ET SYSTÈME MURAL COMPRENANT UN GOUJON DIRECTIONNEL | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4093389 (WIBROW GUNTER) [A] 1-8* entire document *; | [A]US2004099339 (MILLER MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-8 * entire document *; | [A]US2008245030 (SIEBER DOMINIK [CH]) [A] 1-8 * entire document *; | [X]US10005586 (MILLER MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 4 * entire document * |