EP3957652 - ANTI-FXI/FXIA ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sichuan Kelun-Biotech Biopharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No.666, Xinhua Avenue (section 2) Hai Xia Industrial Park Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | For all designated states Klus Pharma Inc. 8 Clarke Drive Suite 4 Cranbury NJ 08512 / US | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Haijun 8 Clarke Drive, Suite 4 Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 02 /
LIU, Dengnian No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | 03 /
DENG, Sujun 8 Clarke Drive, Suite 4 Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 04 /
CIUCCI, Marc Peter 8 Clarke Drive, Suite 4 Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 05 /
WANG, Cheng No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | 06 /
ZHENG, Yong No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | 07 /
XIAO, Liang No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | 08 /
XUE, Tongtong No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Jingyi No.666, Xinhua Avenue (Section 2), Hai Xia Industrial Park, Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan 611138 / CN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20791510.9 | 06.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020CN83413 | Priority number, date | CN201910303627 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910303627 | [2022/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211674 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957652 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/36, C12N15/11, A61K39/395, A61P7/02, G01N33/86 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61P7/02 (EP,KR);
C07K16/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
G01N33/68 (KR);
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/20 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | C07K16/36, C12N15/11, A61K39/395, A61P7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ANTI-FXI/FXIA-ANTIKÖRPER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2022/08] | English: | ANTI-FXI/FXIA ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF | [2022/08] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-FXI/FXIA ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2021 | Translation filed | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017162791 (PROTHIX BV [NL]); | [Y]WO2018116267 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2018145533 (SHANGHAI BENEMAE PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [CN]); | International search | [X]WO2016207858 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2018116255 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) | by applicant | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4275149 | US4277437 | US4366241 | US4816567 | US5225539 | US5530101 | US5585089 | US5693762 | US6180370 | WO0243478 | US8388959 | WO2013167669 | CN104341529 | WO2015141862 |