EP3956541 - MODELING AND SIMULATING FAULTS IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Geoquest Systems B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ The Hague / NL | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Simon 55 Western Avenue, Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RU / GB | 02 /
SANTOSHINI, Samita Schlumberger SIS 18th Floor, Rohas PureCircle No. 9, Jalan P. Ramlee Kuala Lumpur, 50250 / MY | 03 /
GRENFELL, Stephen Schlumberger Oilfield UK PLC 55 Western Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RU / GB | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20791552.1 | 15.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US28200 | Priority number, date | US201962833856P | 15.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962833856 P | US201962833843P | 15.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962833843 P | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020214635 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956541 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01V99/00, // G01V1/30 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G01V20/00 (EP,US);
G01V1/301 (EP,US);
E21B2200/20 (EP);
G01V2210/642 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | E21B41/00, G01V3/08, E21B43/12, E21B47/00, E21B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | MODELLIERUNG UND SIMULATION VON FEHLERN IN UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATIONEN | [2022/08] | English: | MODELING AND SIMULATING FAULTS IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS | [2022/08] | French: | MODÉLISATION ET SIMULATION DE DÉFAUTS DANS DES FORMATIONS SOUTERRAINES | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8315845 (LEPAGE FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US9524590 (MALLET JEAN-LAURENT [LU]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 2, 5 * * column 1, line 40 - line 47 * * column 9, line 5 - line 45 * * column 20, line 6 - line 46 * * column 25, line 48 - line 53 *; | [A]US9600608 (POUDRET MATHIEU [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - HARRIS SIMON ET AL, "SPE-193202-MS Complex Geological Modeling and Quality Assurance Using Unstructured Grids", ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL PETROLEUM EXHIBITION & CONFERENCE, (20181112), doi:10.2118/193202-MS, ISBN 978-1-61399-632-4, XP055834052 [Y] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 6, 8 * * Introduction * * Section "Creation of an accurate structural model", Subsection "Introduction and example dataset" * * Section "Creation of unstructured grid representation of structural model" - Subsection "The depogrid concept" * * Page 10, Section "Analysis of the local axis orthogonality and length." * * Pages 14-15, Section "The representation of directional permeability in flow simulators" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/193202-MS | International search | [A]US2015260016 (FUNG LARRY SIU-KUEN [SA], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0012]-[0017] and claims 1-8 *; | [Y]US9229130 (MALLET JEAN-LAURENT [LU]) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, line 48 - column 21, line 55, claims 1-15, and figures 2, 5 *; | [A]US2016124117 (HUANG HAO [US], et al) [A] 1-20* claims 1-15 *; | [Y]WO2018065027 (TOTAL E&P UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-20 * title, abstract, page 2, line 12 - page 8, line 5, and claims 1-15 *; | [Y]US2018137223 (FUNG LARRY SIU-KUEN [SA], et al) [Y] 13-14 * abstract, paragraph [0034], and claims 2, 3 * | by applicant | US9524590 |