Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
16.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
27.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
14.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
26.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |