EP4037662 - LIPOSOMAL CANNABINOIDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM LTD Hi Tech Park Edmond J. Safra Campus Givat Ram 9139002 Jerusalem / IL | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARENHOLZ, Yechezkel 18 Nave Shaanan Street 9370719 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
CERN, Ahuva 12/4 Nahal Naaman 7173561 Modiin / IL | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20792754.2 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020IL51068 | Priority number, date | US201962910097P | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910097 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064730 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037662 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K31/352, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/40, A61K47/42, A61P25/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,IL);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL);
A61K47/40 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | LIPOSOMALE CANNABINOIDE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/32] | English: | LIPOSOMAL CANNABINOIDS AND USES THEREOF | [2022/32] | French: | CANNABINOÏDES LIPOSOMIQUES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 29.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2013009928 (ORGANIC MEDICAL RES [CA], et al) [XD] 15-19,21-36 * paragraphs [0048] , [0053]; examples 5,6 * [I] 1-14,20; | [XI]WO2015068052 (FULL SPECTRUM LAB LTD [IE]) [X] 1-5,7-10,24-36 * paragraphs [0062] , [0066]; examples 4,9 * [I] 6,11-23; | [XDI]WO2017203529 (BOL PHARMA LTD [IL]) [XD] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0069]; table 1 * [I] 6,9-36; | [A]US2018263953 (RENWICK JEFF SCOTT [CA], et al) [A] 1-36* title;; claim 1 *; | [XI]US2018338866 (KHARAZMI MOHAMMAD ALI [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-11,21-36 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] * [I] 6,8,12-20 | by applicant | WO0103668 | US8242178 | US9095555 | US2017044092 | US2017107280 | US9655910 | US2017281701 | WO2017191630 | WO2017203529 | US2018042845 | US2018185324 | US2018193399 | US2018221304 | WO2018145213 | US2018271924 | US2018289665 | US2018303791 | US10117883 | US2018318237 | - BANGHAM AD, J Mol Biol., (19650000), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 238 - 52 | - SHMEEDA HEVEN-CHEN SHONEN RCOHEN RWEINTRAUB CBARENHOLZ Y, "Enzymatic assays for quality control and pharmacokinetics of liposome formulations: comparison with nonenzymatic conventional methodologies", Methods Enzymol, (20030000), vol. 367, pages 272 - 92 |