EP4035148 - MODAL REVERB EFFECTS FOR AN ACOUSTIC SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eventide Inc. 1 Alsan Way Little Ferry, NJ 07643 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMAN, Woodrow, Q. 375 South End Avenue Apt. 20s New York, NY 10280 / US | 02 /
WEDELICH, Russell Eventide, Inc. 1 Alsan Way Little Ferry, NJ 07643 / US | 03 /
AGNELLO, Anthony, M. Eventide, Inc. 1 Alsan Way Little Ferry, NJ 07643 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20793196.5 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US52386 | Priority number, date | US201916585036 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: US201916585036 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021061906 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035148 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00, G10H1/12, G10K15/08, G10L25/00, H04S7/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G10H1/125 (EP);
G10H1/0091 (EP,US);
G10H1/0008 (US);
G10K11/17854 (EP);
G10K15/02 (EP);
G10K15/08 (EP);
G10L21/003 (EP);
H04S7/305 (EP);
G10G7/02 (US);
G10H2210/281 (EP,US);
G10H5/02 (US);
G10H7/02 (US);
G10L25/48 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | MODALE HALLEFFEKTE FÜR EINEN AKUSTISCHEN RAUM | [2022/31] | English: | MODAL REVERB EFFECTS FOR AN ACOUSTIC SPACE | [2022/31] | French: | EFFETS DE RÉVERBÉRATION MODALE POUR UN ESPACE ACOUSTIQUE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 24.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1516511 (GENELEC OY [FI]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0092] *; | [A]EP2639787 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]EP2902999 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0053] * * abstract *; | [XA]US9805704 (ABEL JONATHAN S [US]) [X] 1,3,9,10,14,16,22,23 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-20 * * column 4, line 43 - column 7, line 28 * * column 8, line 63 - column 14, line 47 * [A] 2,4-8,11-13,15,17-21,24-26; | [A]US10019980 (ABEL JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 12, line 50 * |