EP4051021 - AEROSOL-GENERATING TOBACCO-CONTAINING COMPOSITION COMPRISING MEDIUM-CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International S.A. 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Genève / CH | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LICKEFELD, Daniel Seestrasse 6 54340 Riol / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20793399.5 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP80072 | Priority number, date | EP20190205645 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19205645 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083844 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051021 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4051021 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/12, A24B15/16, A24B15/30 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A24B15/12 (EP,CN,KR);
A24B15/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24B13/02 (KR);
A24B15/14 (US);
A24B15/16 (EP,KR);
A24B15/167 (CN);
A24B15/243 (US);
A24B15/287 (KR);
A24B15/303 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGENDE TABAKHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, MITTELKETTIGES TRIGLYCERID UMFASSEND | [2023/21] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING TOBACCO-CONTAINING COMPOSITION COMPRISING MEDIUM-CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDE | [2022/36] | French: | COMPOSITION GÉNÉRATRICE D'AÉROSOL CONTENANT DU TABAC COMPRENANT DES TRIGLYCÉRIDES À CHAÎNE MOYENNE | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/36] | AEROSOLERZEUGENDE TABAKHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT MITTELKETTIGEM TRIGLYCERID | ||
Former [2022/36] | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DU TABAC GÉNÉRANT UN AÉROSOL COMPRENANT UN TRIGLYCÉRIDE À CHAÎNE MOYENNE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 26.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24155911.1 / EP4338603 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6109272 (SAITO YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US2012118310 (CANTRELL DANIEL VERDIN [US], et al); | [A]US2013284193 (MATSUMOTO HIROFUMI [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2018122375 (JT INT SA [CH]); | [A]US2018310608 (SCIBOZ ALAIN [CH], et al); | [A]WO2019122015 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) | by applicant | WO2017077112 | WO2018122375 |