Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024227542 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A9 | US2024131920 | 25.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51771 | 08.10.2020 | FR1911622 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114555397 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51771 | 08.10.2020 | FR1911622 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4045350 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51771 | 08.10.2020 | FR1911622 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021074506 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1911622 | 17.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3102102 | 29.10.2021 | B1 | FR3102102 | 23.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1911622 | 17.10.2019 |