EP3959698 - PROPERTY CONTROL AND CONFIGURATION BASED ON FLOOR CONTACT MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alarm.com Incorporated 8281 Greensboro Drive, Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRUGH, Alexander 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 02 /
CARONE, Johnathan, Michael 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 03 /
MADDEN, Donald, Gerard 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 04 /
KALAGHER, Mary, Melissa 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 05 /
KONIAR, Daniel, John 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 06 /
YAO, Liyu 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 07 /
ELLIOTT, Martin, Logan 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, John 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | 09 /
MENSAH, William, Wireko 8281 Greensboro Drive Suite 100 Tysons, VA 22102 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794188.1 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29651 | Priority number, date | US201962837466P | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962837466 P | US202016855830 | 22.04.2020 Original published format: US202016855830 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219772 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959698 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/04, G08B21/18, G08B13/10, A61B5/11, G06Q30/00, G07C9/37 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP);
G05B19/4155 (US);
A61B5/1038 (EP,US);
A61B5/1074 (EP,US);
A61B5/1117 (EP,US);
A61B5/6889 (EP,US);
G01G19/44 (EP,US);
G01L1/142 (US);
G01L1/22 (US);
G01L1/242 (US);
G06Q10/06313 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
G08B13/10 (EP);
G08B21/0423 (EP);
G08B21/043 (EP);
G08B21/0469 (EP);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
A61B2503/12 (EP,US);
A61B2505/07 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0266 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (EP);
G05B2219/40062 (US);
G08B13/19695 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G08B21/04, G08B21/18, G08B13/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | EIGENSCHAFTSSTEUERUNG UND KONFIGURATION BASIEREND AUF EINER BODENKONTAKTÜBERWACHUNG | [2022/09] | English: | PROPERTY CONTROL AND CONFIGURATION BASED ON FLOOR CONTACT MONITORING | [2022/09] | French: | COMMANDE ET CONFIGURATION DE PROPRIÉTÉS SUR LA BASE D'UNE SURVEILLANCE DE CONTACT DE SOL | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7382267 (BRENDLEY KEITH W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-12 * column 1, lines 21-25 * * column 1, lines 62-66 * * column 2, lines 13-23 * * column 3, lines 13-48 * * column 4, lines 3-36; figures 1,2,4,5,7,18,19 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 34 * * column 7, lines 25-65 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 38 * * column 11, line 19 - column 12, line 36 * * column 13, line 29 - column 16, line 27 * [Y] 14; | [XI]EP2111791 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0035] , [0043]; figures 1,5,6,27,28 * [I] 13; | [XYI]WO2016118797 (INTERFACE INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0012] - [0017] - [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024] , [0026] , [0034] , [0035] , [0036] , [0040] - [0043]; figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0055] - [0061] * [Y] 14 [I] 13,14; | [Y]US2018018509 (ZHANG PEI [US], et al) [Y] 14* paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * | International search | [Y]JP2006195881 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 18 * , see machine translation *; | [A]US2010171588 (CHUTORASH RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2010305816 (ORLEWSKI PIERRE [LU]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [Y]US7994928 (RICHMOND ROBERT CHARLES [US]) [Y] 6 * , column 3 lines 1-20 *; | [Y]US2016203688 (ZITT PATRICK [US]) [Y] 7-8, 13-15 * , paragraphs [0026]-[0029], [0050] *; | [XYA]WO2016118797 (INTERFACE INC [US]) [X] 1-4, 10-12, 16-17, 19-20 * , abstract, paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0013], [0021], [0023], [0043], [0046], [0056]-[0059] * [Y] 5-8, 13-15, 18 [A] 9; | [Y]KR101897065B (KOREA INTSITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 5 * , see machine translation * | by applicant | US7382267 | EP2111791 | WO2016118797 |