EP3959480 - MANEUVERING AEROMECHANICALLY STABLE SABOT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Kansas 245 Strong Hall 1450 Jayhawk Boulevard Lawrence, Kansas 66045 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Ronald Martin 823 Missouri St. Lawrence, Kansas 66044 / US | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Lauren Nicole 14000 Hwy. 72 Rolla, Missouri 65401 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794611.2 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020IB53899 | Priority number, date | US201962839551P | 26.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962839551 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020217227 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3959480 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F42B14/06, F42B10/02, F42B10/60 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
F42B14/06 (EP);
F42B14/061 (US);
B64D1/04 (US);
F42B10/02 (EP);
F42B10/30 (US);
F42B10/60 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | F42B14/06, F42B14/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | MANÖVRIERUNG EINES AERODYNAMISCH STABILEN TREIBKÄFIGSYSTEMS | [2022/09] | English: | MANEUVERING AEROMECHANICALLY STABLE SABOT SYSTEM | [2022/09] | French: | MANOEUVRE DE SYSTÈME DE SABOT À STABILITÉ AÉROMÉCANIQUE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2238602 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]); | [XAY]FR2757938 (HAMEY PHILIPPE [FR]); | [YA]US2007034073 (BANKS JOHNNY E [US]) | International search | [A]US4534265 (BATES JACK [US], et al); | [A]USH165H ; | [A]US2018216922 (BUCHER RUEDI [CH]) | by applicant | FR2757938 | US6814006 | US2011214582 | US2013312631 |