EP3961826 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE; AND MEDICAL SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND INSPECTION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Takeshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OSHIO, Shozo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NITTA, Mitsuru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794717.7 | 19.02.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020JP06523 | Priority number, date | JP20190082916 | 24.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019082916 | [2022/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020217670 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961826 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3961826 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/77, H01S5/022, A61B1/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, G02B21/06, G02B23/26, H01L33/50, A61B1/04 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (EP);
A61B1/00186 (EP);
A61B1/042 (EP);
A61B1/046 (EP,US);
A61B1/0653 (EP,US);
A61B1/0669 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (EP,US);
C01G15/006 (US);
C09K11/7701 (US);
C09K11/7708 (EP);
C09K11/7721 (US);
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C01P2002/70 (US);
C01P2004/64 (US);
C01P2006/60 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | C09K11/77, H01S5/022, A61B1/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, G02B21/06, G02B23/26, H01L33/50 | ||
Former IPC [2022/09] | H01S5/022, A61B1/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, G02B21/06, G02B23/26, H01L33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM, ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT UND INSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2022/09] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE; AND MEDICAL SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND INSPECTION METHOD USING SAME | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT, ET SYSTÈME MÉDICAL, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION L'UTILISANT | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | Translation filed | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018212112 (NITTA MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO2018207703 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [P]US2020048549 (HONG BYUNGCHUL [JP]) [P] * figure 1; example 2 *; | [E]EP3904488 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0088]; example -; claims 1-18 * | International search | [Y]JP2006114911 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 1-15; | [A]JP2007017986 (AVAGO TECH ECBU IP SG PTE LTD)[A] 1-15; | [Y]JP2013239551 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1-15; | [A]US2016287081 (YANG CHUNXIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2018515913 [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2018518046 [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2018143198 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [Y]WO2018207703 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15; | [A]JP6461411B [A] 1-15 | by applicant | JP2019082916 |