EP3959152 - SELECTIVELY OPENABLE CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berry Global, Inc. 101 Oakley Street Evansville, Indiana 47710 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENCH, Jordan Robert 3700 Aspen Drive Evansvilee, Indiana 47711 / US | 02 /
TEMPEL, Seth A. 1418 Brookside Dr. Evansville, Indiana 47714 / US | 03 /
VASSALLO, John A. 106 Ridgefield Way Lititz, Pennsylvania 17543 / US | 04 /
GIFT, Steven Daniel 316 Cobblers Ct. Lititz, Pennsylvania 17543 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, Matthew David Bryers Intellectual Property Limited Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20794778.9 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29257 | Priority number, date | US201962837541P | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962837541 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219509 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959152 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/04, B65D55/02, B65D41/04, B65D50/00, B65D55/10 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B65D50/046 (EP);
B65D50/043 (US);
B65D1/0246 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | SELEKTIV ZU ÖFFNENDER VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2022/09] | English: | SELECTIVELY OPENABLE CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER | [2022/09] | French: | FERMETURE POUR UN CONTENANT POUVANT ÊTRE OUVERTE DE MANIÈRE SÉLECTIVE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4331247 (MUMFORD GEORGE V) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 17; figure - * [A] 5 [Y] 7,8; | [X]US4752013 (MILLER JACK V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-12,14,15 * figure - *; | [YA]US6612450 (BUONO CAETANO [US]) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 11 - line 26; figure 2b *[A] 4 | International search | [A]US3514003 (FITZGERALD MILLARD C) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US3895730 (KOEHNE ANTHONY J, et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US4512484 (MAR BOB [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [XY]WO9004546 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7, 9-15, 17-20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2, 3; page 3, paragraph 5; page 3, paragraph 4; page 4, paragraph 5; page 4, paragraph 6; page 3, paragraph 2; * [Y] 16; | [A]US5449077 (SEIDLER DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5460281 (RAPCHAK THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2007102856 (KERR RONALD W [US], et al) [Y] 6, 8 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1; para[0052]; *; | [A]US2010051572 (BEECROFT W GORDON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US8292110 (RUTTER BRYCE G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2013075403 (VAN GEEL FILIP DOMINIQUE HUBERT [BE], et al) [Y] 16 * , entire document, especially Fig. 3, 6; para[0059]; *; | [XY]US2013126530 (MORRIS JR GLENN H [US]) [X] 1-3 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2; para[0019]; para[0024]; para[0022]; para[0025]; * [Y] 6, 8; | [A]US2018229902 (GIRAUD JEAN-PIERRE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * | by applicant | US4331247 | US4751013 | US6612450 |