Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12083021 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | B2 | US2023165686 | 01.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318101381 | 25.01.2023 | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US202117594573 | 22.10.2021 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11589998 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2022202583 | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017594573 | 24.04.2020 | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102633326B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2024 | B1 | KR20220002344 | 06.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7522268B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | B2 | JP2023116820 | 22.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021563251 | 24.04.2020 | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7304427B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2023 | B2 | JP2022529538 | 22.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4335414 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | A3 | EP4335414 | 13.03.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20794902 | 24.04.2020 | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114364349 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3137310 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020262482 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3958796 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | B1 | EP3958796 | 28.12.2022 | A4 | EP3958796 | 02.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021013012 | 10.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US29947 | 24.04.2020 | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020219973 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962838633 | 25.04.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4335414 |