EP3779485 - AVAILABLE BATTERY ENERGY DETERMINATION METHOD AND DEVICE, MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUAN, Jian No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
DU, Mingshu No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Shenzhi No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Shichao No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
LU, Yanhua No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Wei No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20794953.8 | 11.04.2020 | [2021/07] | WO2020CN84334 | Priority number, date | CN201910338269 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910338269 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216081 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779485 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779485 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/382, G01R31/374 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G01R31/374 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
G01R31/388 (US);
G01R31/3648 (US);
G01R31/3842 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G01R31/382 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER VERFÜGBAREN BATTERIEENERGIE, VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/07] | English: | AVAILABLE BATTERY ENERGY DETERMINATION METHOD AND DEVICE, MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉNERGIE DE BATTERIE DISPONIBLE, SYSTÈME DE GESTION ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | Translation filed | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2017371000 (FUKUSHIMA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0097] - [0258]; figures 1-38; claims 1-12 * [A] 4,5,7,11,12; | [XA]US2018095141 (WILD MARK [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0092] - [0173]; figures 1-24; claims 79-95 * [A] 4,5,7,11,12; | [A]US2018113174 (FURUKAWA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0026] - [0133]; figures 1-15; claims 1-14 *; | [E]EP3734309 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH09211090 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]FR2946150 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2014379284 (HEO SANG JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [Y]CN105738814 (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al) [Y] 1-16 * description paragraphs 0030-0037, figure 1 *; | [Y]CN105974326 (SINOEV (HEFEI) TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * description paragraphs 0008-0156, figures 2-3, 6, 10, 14-16 *; | [A]CN106909716 (UNIV NORTHEAST DIANLI) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]CN107436418 (JRD COMMUNICATION SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [PX]CN110988702 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * claims 1-16 * |