EP3958984 - CERIUM (III) CARBONATE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATZ, Alexander Los Angeles, CA 94720-1462 / US | 02 /
MISHRA, Manish Los Angeles, CA 94720-1462 Los Angeles, CA 94720-1462 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Snaith, James Michael, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20795288.8 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29521 | Priority number, date | US201962837657P | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962837657 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219674 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958984 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q17/04, A61K8/27, A61K8/29, C01F17/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
C01F17/247 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR);
A61K8/27 (EP,KR);
A61K8/29 (EP,KR);
A61K8/40 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
C01G23/04 (US);
C09B21/00 (US);
C09B31/057 (US);
A61K2800/522 (EP);
A61K2800/592 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON CER (III)-CARBONAT | [2022/09] | English: | CERIUM (III) CARBONATE FORMULATIONS | [2022/09] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE CARBONATE DE CÉRIUM (III) | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5478550 (SUZUKI MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 43 * * column 4, lines 20-47 * * example 2 * * Formulations of cosmetic compositions;; examples 1-6 *; | [Y]WO2012020729 (DAITO KASEI KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 6-7 * * page 5, paragraph 8 - page 6, paragraph 2 ** examples 1,5 *; | [Y]JP5406555B (UNIV TOHOKU) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 7-8 * * example - * | International search | [XYA]US5478550 (SUZUKI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 6/(1-3, 5), 7/(1-3, 5), 8/(1-3, 5) * ; entire document, but especially: col 2 lines 28-41, example 2 * [Y] 4, 6/(4), 7/(4), 8/(4), 15-18 [A] 14; | [Y]US7005404 (HE TING [US]) [Y] 16, 18 * ; col 1 lines 66-67 to col 2 lines 1-5, col 4 lines 34-35 *; | [A]US2008138267 (YADAV TAPESH [US]) [A] 1-8, 14-18* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2012039827 (CHAUDHURI RATAN K [US]) [Y] 4, 6/(4), 7/(4), 8/(4), 15-18 * ; para [0002], para [0003], para [0028], para [0029], para [0031] *; | [A]US2012258154 (PFLUECKER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-8, 14-18 * ; entire document * |