EP3958870 - DERIVATIVES OF GLYCERO-MANNO-HEPTOSE ADP FOR USE IN MODULATING IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Yao Yuan Biotechnology Co., Ltd. Room 701 No.43 Handan Rd. Hongkou District Shanghai 200437 / CN | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Tian Room 701 43 Handan Road Shanghai 200437 / CN | 02 /
XU, Cong Room 701 43 Handan Road Shanghai 200437 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Danyang Room 701 43 Handan Road Shanghai 200437 / CN | 04 /
FAN, Jieqing Room 701 43 Handan Road Shanghai 200437 / CN | 05 /
PAN, Yanfang Room 701 43 Handan Road Shanghai 200437 / CN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20795938.8 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020CN86691 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN84585 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/084585 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216327 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958870 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/708, A61K31/7076, A61K31/7072, A61K31/7068, A61P37/04, A61P25/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07H19/207 (US);
A61K31/7076 (US);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (US);
A61K38/193 (US);
A61K38/20 (US);
A61K38/2046 (US);
A61K38/208 (US);
A61K38/2086 (US);
A61K39/00117 (EP,US);
A61K39/001186 (EP,US);
A61K39/001192 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/20 (US);
A61P37/04 (EP,US);
C07H13/06 (EP);
C07H19/167 (EP);
C07H19/23 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (EP);
A61K2039/55561 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DERIVATE VON GLYCERO-MANNO-HEPTOSE-ADP ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER MODULATION DER IMMUNANTWORT | [2022/09] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF GLYCERO-MANNO-HEPTOSE ADP FOR USE IN MODULATING IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2022/09] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ADP-GLYCÉRO-MANNO-HEPTOSE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LA MODULATION D'UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 30.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1669365 (MUTABILIS SA [FR], et al); | [X]US2010016250 (NAGATA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [PX]WO2019080898 (SHANGHAI YAO YUAN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); |