EP3950860 - SLURRY INCLUDING CARBON BLACK, ELECTRODE PASTE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denka Company Limited 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODA, Akira c/o Denka Company Limited 1-1,Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Tatsuya c/o Denka Company Limited 1-1,Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Tetsuya c/o Denka Company Limited 1-1,Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2024/36] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
YODA, Akira Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAI, Tatsuya Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | |||
03 /
ITO, Tetsuya Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | Representative(s) | Yeadon IP Limited Nexus Discovery Way Leeds LS2 3AA / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20796270.5 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP16942 | Priority number, date | JP20190085855 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019085855 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020218211 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950860 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950860 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00, H01M4/139, H01M4/62 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/56 (US);
H01M4/0404 (KR,US);
H01M4/139 (KR);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (US);
H01M4/525 (US);
H01M4/623 (US);
C01P2004/62 (US);
C01P2006/22 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFSCHLÄMMUNG MIT RUSS, ELEKTRODENPASTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/06] | English: | SLURRY INCLUDING CARBON BLACK, ELECTRODE PASTE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/06] | French: | SUSPENSION COMPRENANT DU NOIR DE CARBONE, PÂTE D'ÉLECTRODE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2021 | Translation filed | 26.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0657953 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]); | [X]EP1058327 (NBT GMBH [DE]); | [X]JP2004281096 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [X]EP2025723 (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]); | [X]JP2015176688 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [X]JP2018190501 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | International search | [A]JPH08151546 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JP2003157846 (MIKUNI COLOR LTD, et al); | [A]JP2009205950 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2013084397 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2013084525 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2013089575 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2013109852 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]KR20160063894 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [YA]JP2017143027 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JP2018530113 ; | [Y]JP2018206579 (LION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003157846 | JP2004281096 | JP2008227481 | JP2011070908 | JP2013109852 | WO2014132809 | JP2014194901 | JP2018062545 |