EP4051427 - DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states UMICORE AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Elena Tulpenweg 2A 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 02 /
KEITL, Gordon Valentin-Senger-Strasse 49 60389 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
HAUPTMANN, Wulf Am Erlenbruch 18 63751 Gelnhausen / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20796623.5 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP80482 | Priority number, date | EP20190206122 | 30.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19206122 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084054 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051427 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/06, B01J23/00, B01J23/10, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01J23/63, B01J29/70, B01J35/00, B01J37/02, B01J37/03 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
B01J35/56 (EP,KR);
B01D53/944 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,KR);
B01J21/12 (US);
B01J23/002 (EP,KR);
B01J23/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,KR);
B01J23/44 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,KR);
B01J29/7007 (EP,KR);
B01J29/7415 (US);
B01J37/0228 (EP,KR);
B01J37/024 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0244 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0246 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0248 (EP,KR);
B01J37/038 (EP,KR);
F01N3/2803 (US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/204 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,KR);
B01D2255/2063 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2092 (US);
B01D2255/30 (US);
B01D2255/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/502 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/9032 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/9035 (US);
B01D2255/909 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2370/02 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | B01J21/06, B01J23/00, B01J23/10, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01J23/63, B01J29/70, B01J35/00, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, B01J37/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | DIESELOXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR | [2022/36] | English: | DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYST | [2022/36] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION DIESEL | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 30.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2016339389 (HOKE JEFFREY B [US], et al); | [Y]US2019162095 (HENGST CHRISTOPH [DE], et al); | by applicant | EP1101528 | US2008045405 | EP2000639 | WO2010083355 | US2010257843 | WO2010133309 | US2011099975 | WO2011057649 | WO2012071421 | WO2012079598 | WO2012137930 | WO2013042080 | WO2013050784 | WO2015031611 | US2016339389 | US2019162095 |