EP3780163 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE, ELECTRODE, POWER STORAGE ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLID ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xubin c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
GANDRUD, Knut Bjarne c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
MEES, Maarten c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 04 /
VEREECKEN, Philippe M. c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
YABE, Hiroki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
ARASE, Hidekazu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20796681.3 | 22.01.2020 | [2021/07] | WO2020JP02180 | Priority number, date | JP20190115275 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019115275 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020255467 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780163 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/80, H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M50/491, H01M50/403, H01M4/02 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H01M10/056 (EP);
H01M10/0565 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M4/80 (EP);
H01M50/403 (EP);
H01M50/491 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01M4/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFELEKTROLYT, ELEKTRODE, STROMSPEICHERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FESTSTOFFELEKTROLYTEN | [2021/07] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE, ELECTRODE, POWER STORAGE ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLID ELECTROLYTE | [2021/07] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE, ÉLECTRODE, ÉLÉMENT DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2020 | Translation filed | 03.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2020 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 24.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018029580 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]); | [X]US2019020069 (MOGANTY SURYA [US], et al) | International search | [X]WO2018197073 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al) | by applicant | JP2012518248 |