EP4055403 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE VOLUME COIL WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT TRANSMIT/RECEIVE CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/37] | MAGNETIC RESONANCE VOLUME COIL WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT TRANSMIT RECEIVE CHANNELS | ||
[2022/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAI, Zhiyong c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HARVEY, Paul Royston Harvey c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20796832.2 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020EP80479 | Priority number, date | US201962930607P | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930607 P | EP20190210015 | 19.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19210015 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021089417 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055403 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4055403 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3415, G01R33/34, G01R33/565 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G01R33/3415 (EP,US);
G01R33/34046 (CN,US);
G01R33/34038 (EP);
G01R33/34053 (EP);
G01R33/5659 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETRESONANZVOLUMENSPULE MIT MEHREREN UNABHÄNGIGEN SENDE-/EMPFANGSKANÄLEN | [2022/42] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE VOLUME COIL WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT TRANSMIT/RECEIVE CHANNELS | [2022/42] | French: | BOBINE DE VOLUME PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE DOTÉE DE MULTIPLES CANAUX DE TRANSMISSION/RÉCEPTION INDÉPENDANTS | [2022/42] |
Former [2022/37] | MAGNETRESONANZVOLUMENSPULE MIT MEHREREN UNABHÄNGIGEN SENDEEMPFANGSKANÄLEN | ||
Former [2022/37] | MAGNETIC RESONANCE VOLUME COIL WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENT TRANSMIT RECEIVE CHANNELS | ||
Former [2022/37] | BOBINE VOLUMIQUE À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE À CANAUX MULTIPLES D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION INDÉPENDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 07.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1156806 (GE YOKOGAWA MED SYST LTD) [A] 1-11 * figure 6 *; | [AD]US2015130465 (WIGGINS GRAHAM CHARLES [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 6 *; | [AD]US2018246179 (ZHAI ZHIYONG [NL], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0076] ** figures 2, 6, 7 *; | [A] - JAN PASKA ET AL, "A Hybrid 8 channel TR Dipole and 8 channel Rx Birdcage Body Coil Array for 7T", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ISMRM, 24TH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXHIBITION, SINGAPORE, 7-13 MAY 2016, (20160422), no. 2134, XP040683175 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - KIM HAN-JOONG ET AL, "Numerical Calculations of Multi-Channel Receiver Coil Array with High-Pass Spoke Coil for Parallel MRI", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, KOREAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, KR, vol. 74, no. 11, doi:10.3938/JKPS.74.1073, ISSN 0374-4884, (20190611), pages 1073 - 1078, (20190611), XP036803787 [A] 1-11 * Section 2 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3938/jkps.74.1073 | by applicant | US6522143 | US2015130465 |