EP4048509 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURE OF WIND TURBINE BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDALL, Stephen 23 Coronation Rd Cowes PO31 7JY / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Jonathan 200 Botley Road Burridge SO311BL / GB | 03 /
BECH, Anton Los Girasoles fase 1. Casa 15 13005 Ciudad Real / ES | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20797024.5 | 21.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020DK50289 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA70662 | 23.10.2019 Original published format: DK PA201970662 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021078347 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048509 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/50, C09J7/35, C09J201/00, F03D1/06, B29L31/08 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B29C66/545 (EP);
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/5021 (EP);
B29C65/5028 (EP);
B29C65/5057 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/301 (EP);
B29C66/543 (EP);
B29C66/61 (EP);
B29C66/636 (EP);
B29C66/8264 (EP);
C08J5/12 (EP);
C09J5/06 (EP);
C09J7/10 (EP);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
F03D1/0684 (US);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (US);
B29K2063/00 (US);
B29K2067/00 (US);
B29K2105/0097 (US);
B29K2105/04 (US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29L2031/085 (EP);
C09J2203/35 (EP);
C09J2301/208 (EP);
F05D2230/23 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON WINDTURBINENSCHAUFELN | [2022/35] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURE OF WIND TURBINE BLADES | [2022/35] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS SE RAPPORTANT À LA FABRICATION DE PALES D'ÉOLIENNE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007048408 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al); | [XI]DE102008037386 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]GB2535697 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [XA]US2017067439 (YARBROUGH AARON A [US], et al) |