Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.02.2023 [2023/05] |
30.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 01.02.2023 [2023/05] |
09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.10.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
04.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
20.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
04.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |