EP4068943 - ROBOTIC WORK TOOL, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUSQVARNA AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLIMBERG, Tommy Västanbogatan 11 571 33 NÄSSJÖ / SE | 02 /
GRUFMAN, Stefan Höjdhoppsvägen 44 564 34 BANKERYD / SE | 03 /
KALLSTRÖM, Fredrik Postgatan 3 561 91 HUSKVARNA / SE | 04 /
KAMFORS, Mattias Narvavägen 11A 554 48 JÖNKÖPING / SE | 05 /
LILJEDAHL, Marcus Göransbergsvägen 48 561 38 HUSKVARNA / SE | 06 /
MANNEFRED, Björn Skinnersdal 38 555 92 JÖNKÖPING / SE | 07 /
HELLSIN, Beppe Norra Bogesundsgatan 2 554 73 JÖNKÖPING / SE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20797049.2 | 15.10.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP78977 | Priority number, date | SE20190051391 | 04.12.2019 Original published format: SE 1951391 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110310 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068943 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4068943 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, A01D34/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A01D34/008 (EP,US);
G05D1/43 (SE);
G05D1/0259 (US);
G05D1/245 (EP);
G05D1/247 (EP);
G05D1/248 (EP);
G05D1/6484 (EP);
G05D2105/15 (EP);
G05D2107/23 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | A01D34/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER-ARBEITSWERKZEUG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2024/10] | English: | ROBOTIC WORK TOOL, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATION THEREOF | [2022/41] | French: | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL ROBOTIQUE, SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/41] | ROBOTERARBEITSWERKZEUG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | ||
Former [2022/41] | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL ROBOTIQUE, SYSTÈME ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 07.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3018548 (F ROBOTICS ACQUISITIONS LTD [IL]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016102145 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN105988472 (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO LTD ) [X] 1,6,7,12,16 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,8-11,13-15,17; | [A]EP3533311 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |